Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Enrique Sánchez Martínez

Bishop of Nuevo Laredo, Tamaulipas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Dec 1960 BornCuencamé
29 Jun 198625.5Ordained PriestPriest of Durango, México
21 Jul 200847.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Durango, México
21 Jul 200847.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Thamugadi
10 Oct 200847.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thamugadi
16 Nov 201554.9AppointedBishop of Nuevo Laredo, Tamaulipas, México
13 Jan 201655.1InstalledBishop of Nuevo Laredo, Tamaulipas, México

MicroData Summary for Enrique Sánchez Martínez:
Bishop Enrique Sánchez Martínez (born ) Bishop of Nuevo Laredo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Nuevo Laredo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 Jul 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Number 15,979
  • ab: Bollettino, 16 Nov 2015
  • i: CB, 16 Dec 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 16 Dec 2015