Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tiago Miguel (James Michael) Ryan, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Santarém, Para


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Nov 1912BornChicago, IL, USA
24 Jun 193825.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
31 Jan 195845.2AppointedPrelate of Santarém, Para, Brazil
31 Jan 195845.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Margum
9 Apr 195845.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Margum
26 May 197865.5ResignedTitular Bishop of Margum
4 Dec 197967.0AppointedBishop of Santarém, Para, Brazil
27 Nov 198573.0ResignedBishop of Santarém, Para, Brazil
12 Jul 200289.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Santarém, Para, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Tiago Miguel (James Michael) Ryan:
Bishop Tiago Miguel (James Michael) Ryan O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Santarém

  • a priest for 64.1 years
  • a bishop for 44.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013