Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Manuel Sanz y Saravia

Deceased

Bishop of Jaén


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Mar 1848BornPuebla de los Infantes
25 May 187224.1Ordained PriestPriest of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
27 Mar 190556.9AppointedBishop of León, Spain
23 Jul 190557.3Ordained BishopBishop of León, Spain
29 Apr 190961.0AppointedBishop of Jaén, Spain
19 Jun 191971.2DiedBishop of Jaén, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Manuel Sanz y Saravia:
Bishop Juan Manuel Sanz y Saravia (born , died ) Bishop of Jaén

  • a priest for 47.0 years
  • a bishop for 13.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1905, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015