Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giambattista Cardinal Rubini

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Vicenza

Cardinal-Priest of San Marco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jun 1642BornVenice
19 Sep 168341.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
21 Sep 168341.2Ordained PriestPriest
15 May 168441.9AppointedBishop of Vicenza, Italy
21 May 168441.9Ordained BishopBishop of Vicenza, Italy
13 Feb 169047.6Elevated to Cardinal
10 Apr 169047.8InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Panisperna
25 Mar 170259.8ResignedBishop of Vicenza, Italy
25 Jun 170664.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Marco
17 Feb 170764.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Vicenza, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giambattista Rubini:
Giambattista Cardinal Rubini (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Vicenza

  • a priest for 23.4 years
  • a bishop for 22.7 years
  • a cardinal for 17.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 13 Feb 1690
  • c34: CB, 1 Jun 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1684, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 20 May 2015