Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sebastiano Venieri

Deceased

Bishop of Vicenza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Oct 1658BornVenice
2 Feb 170243.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
5 Feb 170243.3Ordained PriestPriest
8 May 170243.5AppointedBishop of Vicenza, Italy
14 May 170243.5Ordained BishopBishop of Vicenza, Italy
22 Jan 173879.2DiedBishop of Vicenza, Italy

MicroData Summary for Sebastiano Venieri:
Bishop Sebastiano Venieri (born , died ) Bishop of Vicenza

  • a priest for 35.9 years
  • a bishop for 35.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 414
  • ob/c2+: CB, 23 Sep 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 220, Number 18,243
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1702, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 20 May 2015