Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emanuele Romano

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Trapani


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jan 1912BornGela
26 Jul 193624.5Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jun 197361.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Monreale, Italy
20 Jun 197361.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Nigrae Maiores
22 Jul 197361.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nigrae Maiores
24 Jan 197866.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Trapani, Italy
31 Jul 197866.5SucceededBishop of Trapani, Italy
8 Sep 198876.6RetiredBishop of Trapani, Italy
9 Feb 199886.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Trapani, Italy

MicroData Summary for Emanuele Romano:
Bishop Emanuele Romano (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Trapani

  • a priest for 61.5 years
  • a bishop for 24.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 136
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013