Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Claude Rolland, M.S. †

Deceased

Bishop of Antsirabé, Madagascar


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Aug 1910Born
12 Jul 193625.9Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Our Lady of La Salette
19 Dec 195545.3AppointedBishop of Antsirabé, Madagascar
12 Feb 195645.4Ordained BishopBishop of Antsirabé, Madagascar
15 Oct 197363.1DiedBishop of Antsirabé, Madagascar

MicroData Summary for Claude Rolland
Bishop Claude Rolland M.S. (born , died ) Bishop of Antsirabé

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSantec, France

  • a priest for 37.2 years
  • a bishop for 17.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • ob/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1956, Number 13
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 19, Number 1,019, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast