Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angel Martínez Vivas, O.SS.T. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tsiroanomandidy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 May 1904BornLaguna de Negrillos, Spain
3 Jul 192723.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of the Most Holy Trinity
14 Jan 194944.6AppointedPrefect of Tsiroanomandidy, Madagascar
9 Apr 195954.9AppointedBishop of Tsiroanomandidy, Madagascar
19 Jul 195955.1Ordained BishopBishop of Tsiroanomandidy, Madagascar
30 Jul 197773.2RetiredBishop of Tsiroanomandidy, Madagascar
23 Jul 198177.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Tsiroanomandidy, Madagascar

MicroData Summary for Angel Martínez Vivas:
Bishop Angel Martínez Vivas O.SS.T. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tsiroanomandidy

  • a priest for 54.0 years
  • a bishop for 22.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1959, Number 68

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015