Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Julián Barrio Barrio

Archbishop of Santiago de Compostela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1946 BornManganeses de la Polvorosa
4 Jul 197124.8Ordained PriestPriest of Astorga, Spain
31 Dec 199246.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
31 Dec 199246.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Sasabe
7 Feb 199346.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sasabe
5 Jan 199649.3AppointedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain

MicroData Summary for Julián Barrio Barrio:
Archbishop Julián Barrio Barrio (born ) Archbishop of Santiago de Compostela

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Santiago de Compostela.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133, Number 12,000

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 7 May 2015