Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lindomar Rocha Mota

Bishop of São Luís de Montes Belos, Goias, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Nov 1971 Born
20 Feb 199826.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Diamantina, Minas Gerais, Brazil
26 Jul 199826.6Ordained PriestPriest of Diamantina, Minas Gerais, Brazil
22 Jan 202048.1AppointedBishop of São Luís de Montes Belos, Goias, Brazil
14 Mar 202048.3Ordained BishopBishop of São Luís de Montes Belos, Goias, Brazil
16 May 202048.4InstalledBishop of São Luís de Montes Belos, Goias, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Lindomar Rocha Mota
Bishop Lindomar Rocha Mota (born ) Bishop of São Luís de Montes Belos

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArataca, Diocese of Ilhéus, Bahia
Ordained PriestSanta Maria della Perseveranza, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopSão Geraldo, Basilica, Curvelo, Archdiocese of Diamantina, Minas Gerais

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of São Luís de Montes Belos.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Jan 2020
  • ob/c2+: CB, 22 Jan 2020
  • i: AM, 4 Mar 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast