Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Collins, S.M.A. †

Deceased

Apostolic Internuncio to Liberia

Titular Bishop of Thala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Aug 1889Born
15 Jun 191323.8Ordained PriestPriest of Society of African Missions
26 Feb 193242.5AppointedPrefect of Liberia, Liberia
20 Sep 193243.0AppointedOfficial to Liberia
9 Apr 193444.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Thala
9 Apr 193444.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Liberia, Liberia
30 Sep 193445.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thala
12 Jul 195161.8AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Liberia
20 Dec 196071.3ResignedVicar Apostolic of Monrovia, Liberia
3 Mar 196171.5DiedApostolic Internuncio to Liberia

MicroData Summary for John Collins
Bishop John Collins S.M.A. (born , died ) Apostolic Internuncio of Liberia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLeap, Ireland

  • a priest for 47.7 years
  • a bishop for 26.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1934, Number 68
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 165

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast