Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Adolfo Pérez y Aguilar

Deceased

Archbishop of San Salvador, El Salvador


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 May 1839Born
21 Mar 186323.8Ordained PriestPriest
13 Jan 188848.6AppointedBishop of San Salvador, El Salvador
29 Jun 188849.1Ordained BishopBishop of San Salvador, El Salvador
11 Feb 191373.7AppointedArchbishop of San Salvador, El Salvador
17 Apr 192686.9DiedArchbishop of San Salvador, El Salvador

MicroData Summary for Antonio Adolfo Pérez y Aguilar
Archbishop Antonio Adolfo Pérez y Aguilar (born , died ) Archbishop of San Salvador

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Salvador, Diocese of San Salvador
Ordained BishopSalvador del Mundo, Cathedral, San Salvador, Diocese of San Salvador

  • a priest for 63.0 years
  • a bishop for 37.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 495
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1888, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018