Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco de Paula Mas y Oliver

Deceased

Bishop of Gerona, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Nov 1860Born
20 Dec 188424.0Ordained PriestPriest
10 Apr 191554.3AppointedBishop of Gerona, Spain
4 Jul 191554.6Ordained BishopBishop of Gerona, Spain
16 Apr 192059.3DiedBishop of Gerona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Francisco de Paula Mas y Oliver
Bishop Francisco de Paula Mas y Oliver (born , died ) Bishop of Gerona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMataró
Ordained BishopS. Maria, Mataró

  • a priest for 35.3 years
  • a bishop for 4.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,915, Number 40
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 581
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 13, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast