Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Justí Guitart y Vilardebó

Deceased

Bishop of Urgell, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Dec 1875Born
1 Jun 190125.4Ordained PriestPriest of Barcelona, Spain
9 Jan 192044.0AppointedBishop of Urgell, Spain
23 May 192044.4Ordained BishopBishop of Urgell, Spain
31 Jan 194064.1DiedBishop of Urgell, Spain

MicroData Summary for Justí Guitart y Vilardebó
Bishop Justí Guitart y Vilardebó (born , died ) Bishop of Urgell

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBarcelona

  • a priest for 38.6 years
  • a bishop for 19.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1920, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast