Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Donald Francis Hanchon

Auxiliary Bishop of Detroit, Michigan

Titular Bishop of Horreomargum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Oct 1947 BornWayne, MI
19 Oct 197427.0Ordained PriestPriest of Detroit, Michigan, USA
22 Mar 201163.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Detroit, Michigan, USA
22 Mar 201163.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Horreomargum
5 May 201163.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Horreomargum

MicroData Summary for Donald Francis Hanchon:
Bishop Donald Francis Hanchon (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Detroit

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Detroit.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Mar 2011
  • ob/c2+: CB, 25 Apr 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206, Number 17,048

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013