Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Palmyre-Georges Jansoone

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Lille, France

Titular Bishop of Nilopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jun 1858Born
3 Jul 188123.0Ordained PriestPriest of Cambrai, France
25 Oct 191355.3IncardinatedPriest of Lille, France
14 Jan 192768.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lille, France
14 Jan 192768.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Nilopolis
19 Mar 192768.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nilopolis
4 Sep 194082.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Lille, France

MicroData Summary for Palmyre-Georges Jansoone
Bishop Palmyre-Georges Jansoone (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Lille

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDunquerque

  • a priest for 59.1 years
  • a bishop for 13.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1927, Number 5
  • opd/inca: AJ, 26 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 27 Jul 2018

Quantcast