Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mattia Vicario

Deceased

Bishop of Novara, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Apr 1849Born
16 Mar 187222.9Ordained PriestPriest of Vercelli, Italy
18 Mar 189545.9AppointedBishop of Saluzzo, Italy
28 Apr 189546.0Ordained BishopBishop of Saluzzo, Italy
19 Apr 189647.0InstalledBishop of Saluzzo, Italy
16 Dec 190152.6AppointedBishop of Novara, Italy
19 Oct 190253.5InstalledBishop of Novara, Italy
5 Mar 190656.9DiedBishop of Novara, Italy

MicroData Summary for Mattia Vicario (VIAF: 90211502)
Bishop Mattia Vicario (born , died ) Bishop of Novara

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFontanetto Po, Archdiocese of Vercelli
Ordained BishopCathedral, Vercelli, Archdiocese of Vercelli

  • a priest for 33.9 years
  • a bishop for 10.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 420, and Page 495
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1895, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 5 Jun 2017