Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ludovico Gavotti

Deceased

Archbishop of Genova


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Nov 1868BornGenova
27 May 189324.5Ordained PriestPriest of Genova, Italy
22 Jun 190334.6AppointedBishop of Casale Monferrato, Italy
5 Jul 190334.6Ordained BishopBishop of Casale Monferrato, Italy
22 Jan 191546.2AppointedArchbishop of Genova, Italy
23 Dec 191850.1DiedArchbishop of Genova, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ludovico Gavotti:
Archbishop Ludovico Gavotti (born , died ) Archbishop of Genova

  • a priest for 25.6 years
  • a bishop for 15.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1917
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1919
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 187
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1903, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013