Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Territorial Prelature of Tromsų

Praelatura Territorialis Tromsoeanus



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Berislav Grgić, Prelate

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Territorial Prelature
  • Elevated: 28 March 1979
  • Immediately Subject to the Holy See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Norway
  • Square Kilometers: 173,968 (67,195 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Postboks 132, Storgata 94, N-9252 Tromso, Norge
  • Telephone: 776.85.604
  • Fax: 776.84.414

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Mission "Sui Iuris" of Northern Norway {Norvegia Settentrionale}
8 April 1931ErectedMission "Sui Iuris" of Northern Norway {Norvegia Settentrionale} (erected)
Prefecture Apostolic of Northern Norway {Norvegia Settentrionale}
10 March 1944ElevatedMission "Sui Iuris" of Northern Norway {Norvegia Settentrionale} Prefecture Apostolic of Northern Norway {Norvegia Settentrionale}
Vicariate Apostolic of Northern Norway {Norvegia Settentrionale}
18 February 1955ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Northern Norway {Norvegia Settentrionale} Vicariate Apostolic of Northern Norway {Norvegia Settentrionale}
Territorial Prelature of Tromsų
28 March 1979ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Northern Norway {Norvegia Settentrionale} Territorial Prelature of Tromsų

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Prefecture Apostolic of Northern Norway {Norvegia Settentrionale}
1949266338,245.1%8833274ap1951
Vicariate Apostolic of Northern Norway {Norvegia Settentrionale}
1963353413,123.1%7750354ap1971
Territorial Prelature of Tromsų
1980600483,000.1%661006215ap1981
1990820485,500.2%771177206ap1991
19991,562480,000.3%1101114210306ap2000
20001,565480,000.3%1891738276ap2001
20011,694467,072.4%1891888256ap2002
20021,675580,000.3%1782097256ap2003
20031,651462,711.4%1891838226ap2004
20041,775467,702.4%28101778257ap2005
20135,054477,3981.1%38114598217ap2014

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_d, v3.0.5, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 20 Jan 2015