Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juozapas Matulaitis-Labukas

Bishop Emeritus of Kaišiadorys


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Mar 1936 BornUžgireliai
25 Mar 196428.0Ordained PriestPriest
10 Mar 198953.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Kaišiadorys, Lithuania
10 Mar 198953.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Sicilibba
18 Mar 198953.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sicilibba
24 Dec 199155.8AppointedBishop of Kaišiadorys, Lithuania
11 Feb 201275.9RetiredBishop of Kaišiadorys, Lithuania

MicroData Summary for Juozapas Matulaitis-Labukas:
Bishop Juozapas Matulaitis-Labukas (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Kaišiadorys

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kaišiadorys.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 115, Number 10,245
  • r: Bollettino, 11 Feb 2012
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2011, Page 343
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 159, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013