Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Annet-Théophile Pinchon, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Northwestern Szechwan {Se-Ciuen Settentrionale-Occidentale}, China

Titular Bishop of Polemonium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1814Born
21 Dec 183925.9Ordained PriestPriest
1845¹30.9ProfessedPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
23 Apr 185945.2AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Northwestern Szechwan {Se-Ciuen Settentrionale-Occidentale}, China
23 Apr 185945.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Polemonium
4 Sep 185945.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Polemonium
6 May 186147.3SucceededVicar Apostolic of Northwestern Szechwan {Se-Ciuen Settentrionale-Occidentale}, China
26 Oct 189177.8DiedVicar Apostolic of Northwestern Szechwan {Se-Ciuen Settentrionale-Occidentale}, China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Annet-Théophile Pinchon
Bishop Annet-Théophile Pinchon M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Northwestern Szechwan {Se-Ciuen Settentrionale-Occidentale}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChard, Diocese of Limoges, France
Ordained BishopHo-kia-in
Death PlaceTchentu

  • a priest for 51.8 years
  • a bishop for 32.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 461
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1859, Number 41
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 3, Number 118, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 10, Number 471, Ascendance
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Jan 2020
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 18, Number 962, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast