Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Eparchy of Mananthavady (Syro-Malabarese)

Eparchia Manantoddiensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Josť Porunnedom, Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Eparchy
  • Erected: 1 March 1973
  • Metropolitan: Archeparchy of Tellicherry (Syro-Malabarese)
  • Syro-Malabarese Catholic Church of the Chaldean Tradition
  • Country: India
  • Square Kilometers: 48,250 (18,636 Square Miles)
  • Description: Federal States of Kerala, Karnataka and Tamil Nadu
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diocesemdy.org/
  • Mailing Address: P.B. 1, Mananthavady-670645, Wayanad Dt., Kerala, India
  • Telephone: (0493)540.745
  • Fax: 540.265

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
1 March 1973ErectedEparchy of Tellicherry (Syro-Malabarese) Eparchy of Mananthavady (Syro-Malabarese) (erected)
29 August 2007Territory LostEparchy of Mananthavady (Syro-Malabarese) Eparchy of Bhadravathi (Syro-Malabarese) (erected)
18 January 2010Territory LostEparchy of Mananthavady (Syro-Malabarese) Eparchy of Mandya (Syro-Malabarese) (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1980110,21764641,72217366103ap1981
1990130,0008,526,0001.5%84101185702119795130ap1991
1999171,0008,105,0002.1%142812237662581,339127ap2000
2000171,2008,107,0002.1%145602058352341,386153ap2001
2001162,8009,500,0001.7%152602127672421,323153ap2002
2002164,82310,000,0001.6%151602117812391,180153ap2003
2003165,65310,000,0001.7%206602666222391,371156ap2004
2004166,00010,000,0001.7%2121503624583041,427157ap2005
2009167,20010,395,3941.6%2252244493723851,502142ap2010

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 10 Jul 2013