Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Foralosso, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Marabá, Para


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Mar 1938BornCervarese S. Croce
22 Dec 196628.8Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
20 Nov 199153.7AppointedBishop of Guiratinga, Mato Grosso, Brazil
15 Feb 199253.9Ordained BishopBishop of Guiratinga, Mato Grosso, Brazil
12 Jan 200061.8AppointedBishop of Marabá, Para, Brazil
25 Apr 201274.1ResignedBishop of Marabá, Para, Brazil
22 Aug 201274.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Marabá, Para, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Foralosso:
Bishop José Foralosso S.D.B. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Marabá

  • a priest for 45.7 years
  • a bishop for 20.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129, Number 11,615
  • r: Bollettino, 25 Apr 2012
  • d: CB, 22 Aug 2012
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013