Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Simon Peter Poh Hoon Seng

Archbishop of Kuching, Malaysia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Apr 1963 Born
31 Jul 198825.2Ordained PriestPriest of Kuching, Malaysia
9 Jul 201552.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kuching, Malaysia
9 Jul 201552.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Sfasferia
24 Sep 201552.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sfasferia
4 Mar 201753.8AppointedArchbishop of Kuching, Malaysia
20 Mar 201753.9InstalledArchbishop of Kuching, Malaysia

MicroData Summary for Simon Peter Poh Hoon Seng
Archbishop Simon Peter Poh Hoon Seng (born ) Archbishop of Kuching

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSri Aman

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Kuching.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 9 Jul 2015
  • ob: CB, 13 Jul 2015
  • c2+: CB, 23 Sep 2015
  • mn: CB, 8 Oct 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 224, Number 18,580
  • ab: Bollettino, 4 Mar 2017
  • i: CB, 4 Mar 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Mar 2017