Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignatius Phakoe, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Leribe, Lesotho

Titular Bishop of Bettonium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jul 1927Born
7 Jul 195224.9Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
3 Jan 196133.4AppointedBishop of Leribe, Lesotho
21 May 196133.8Ordained BishopBishop of Leribe, Lesotho
18 Jun 196840.9ResignedBishop of Leribe, Lesotho
18 Jun 196840.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Bettonium
23 Jul 198962.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Leribe, Lesotho

MicroData Summary for Ignatius Phakoe
Bishop Ignatius Phakoe O.M.I. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Leribe

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKoro-Koro

  • a priest for 37.0 years
  • a bishop for 28.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast