Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Timoteo Pérez Vargas, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ispahan

Titular Bishop of Lystra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1595¹BornPalermo, Italy
8 Jun 161217.4ProfessedMember of Order of Discalced Carmelites
6 Sep 163237.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Ispahan, Iran
6 Sep 163237.6AppointedBishop of Baghdad, Iraq
19 Sep 163237.7Ordained BishopBishop of Baghdad, Iraq
5 Sep 163338.6SucceededBishop of Ispahan, Iran
23 Dec 163944.9ResignedBishop of Ispahan, Iran
23 Dec 163944.9ResignedBishop of Baghdad, Iraq
23 Dec 163944.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Lystra
5 Apr 165156.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Ispahan, Iran

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Timoteo Pérez Vargas:
Bishop Timoteo Pérez Vargas O.C.D. (born 1595, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ispahan

  • a bishop for 18.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 106, and Page 97
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 226
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 135, Number 12,091
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 155, Number 986
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1632, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 14 Apr 2015