Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Diego Alarcón y Covarrubias

Deceased

Bishop of Córdoba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Mar 1589BornValladolid
11 Apr 163950.0AppointedBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
18 Sep 163950.4Ordained BishopBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
18 Oct 164556.5AppointedBishop of Salamanca, Spain
1 Mar 164858.9SelectedBishop of Pamplona, Spain
6 Jul 164859.2ConfirmedBishop of Pamplona, Spain
24 Sep 165768.4AppointedBishop of Córdoba, Spain
18 May 167586.1DiedBishop of Córdoba, Spain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Diego Alarcón y Covarrubias:
Bishop Francisco Diego Alarcón y Covarrubias (born , died ) Bishop of Córdoba

  • a bishop for 35.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 124, Number 11,162
  • bp/bd/ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 128, Number 11,505
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129, Number 11,573
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 151, and Page 164
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 272, and Page 300
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 166, Number 1,044

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015