Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Paiño Sevilla

Deceased

Archbishop of Sevilla {Seville}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Sep 1599BornMedina de Ríoseco
21 May 164242.7SelectedBishop of Orense, Spain
13 Jul 164343.8ConfirmedBishop of Orense, Spain
4 Oct 164344.0Ordained BishopBishop of Orense, Spain
18 Aug 165353.9AppointedBishop of Zamora, Spain
25 Feb 165858.4AppointedArchbishop of Burgos, Spain
3 May 166363.6SelectedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
4 Jun 166363.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
25 May 166969.7DiedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Paiño Sevilla:
Archbishop Antonio Paiño Sevilla (born , died ) Archbishop of Sevilla {Seville}

  • a bishop for 25.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,857
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 104, and Page 124
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 204, and Page 376
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 172, Number 1,071

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015