Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Velasco Acevedo

Deceased

Bishop of Orense


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Mar 1586BornTorre de Mormojón
1611²24.7Ordained PriestPriest
2 Mar 163750.9AppointedBishop of Orense, Spain
24 May 163751.1Ordained BishopBishop of Orense, Spain
8 Feb 164255.8DiedBishop of Orense, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Velasco Acevedo:
Bishop Juan Velasco Acevedo (born , died ) Bishop of Orense

  • a priest for 31.1 years
  • a bishop for 4.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,849
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 103
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 164, Number 1,032
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1637, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015