Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pedro Urbina Montoya, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Sevilla {Seville}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Aug 1585BornBerantevilla
22 Feb 160923.5ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
2 May 164458.7AppointedBishop of Coria, Spain
11 Sep 164459.1Ordained BishopBishop of Coria, Spain
30 Dec 164863.4SelectedArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
28 Jun 164963.9ConfirmedArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
18 Dec 164964.3InstalledArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
1 Apr 165872.6AppointedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
6 Feb 166377.5DiedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Urbina Montoya:
Archbishop Pedro Urbina Montoya O.F.M. (born , died ) Archbishop of Sevilla {Seville}

  • a bishop for 18.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 143, and Page 357
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 204

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 12 Dec 2013