Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Daniel Francis Desmond

Deceased

Bishop of Alexandria, Louisiana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Apr 1884BornHaverhill, MA
9 Jun 191127.1Ordained PriestPriest
16 Dec 193248.6AppointedBishop of Alexandria, Louisiana, USA
5 Jan 193348.7Ordained BishopBishop of Alexandria, Louisiana, USA
11 Sep 194561.4DiedBishop of Alexandria, Louisiana, USA

MicroData Summary for Daniel Francis Desmond:
Bishop Daniel Francis Desmond (born , died ) Bishop of Alexandria

  • a priest for 34.2 years
  • a bishop for 12.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1933, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015