Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Agostinho Stefan Januszewicz, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Luziânia, Goias, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Nov 1930Born
4 Oct 195423.8ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
3 Aug 195827.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
29 Mar 198958.3AppointedBishop of Luziânia, Goias, Brazil
10 Jun 198958.5Ordained BishopBishop of Luziânia, Goias, Brazil
15 Sep 200473.7ResignedBishop of Luziânia, Goias, Brazil
20 Mar 201180.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Luziânia, Goias, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Agostinho Stefan Januszewicz
Bishop Agostinho Stefan Januszewicz O.F.M. Conv. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Luziânia

EventPlace
Birth PlacePodwojponie, Poland

  • a priest for 52.6 years
  • a bishop for 21.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117, Number 10,458
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast