Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Dallepiane

Deceased

Bishop of Iglesias, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Nov 1860Born
22 Sep 191150.8AppointedBishop of Iglesias, Italy
30 Nov 191151.0Ordained BishopBishop of Iglesias, Italy
13 Apr 192059.3DiedBishop of Iglesias, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Dallepiane
Bishop Giuseppe Dallepiane (born , died ) Bishop of Iglesias

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNibbiano
Ordained BishopPiacenza, Diocese of Piacenza

  • a bishop for 8.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1911, Number 94
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 33, Number 1,944

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast