Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Palmeira da Rocha

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Pesqueira, Pernambuco, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Mar 1919Born
30 Nov 194728.7Ordained PriestPriest
14 Mar 198061.0AppointedBishop of Pesqueira, Pernambuco, Brazil
27 Apr 198061.1Ordained BishopBishop of Pesqueira, Pernambuco, Brazil
26 May 199374.2ResignedBishop of Pesqueira, Pernambuco, Brazil
2 Sep 200283.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Pesqueira, Pernambuco, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Manuel Palmeira da Rocha
Bishop Manuel Palmeira da Rocha (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Pesqueira

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCampina Grande

  • a priest for 54.7 years
  • a bishop for 22.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast