Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Carlos Gouvêa Coelho

Deceased

Archbishop of Olinda e Recife, Pernambuco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Dec 1907BornJoão Pessôa
9 Feb 193022.1Ordained PriestPriest
10 Jan 194840.0AppointedBishop of Nazaré, Pernambuco, Brazil
2 May 194840.3Ordained BishopBishop of Nazaré, Pernambuco, Brazil
14 Dec 195447.0AppointedBishop of Niterói (Nictheroy), Brazil
23 Apr 196052.3AppointedArchbishop of Olinda e Recife, Pernambuco, Brazil
7 Mar 196456.2DiedArchbishop of Olinda e Recife, Pernambuco, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Carlos Gouvêa Coelho:
Archbishop Carlos Gouvêa Coelho (born , died ) Archbishop of Olinda e Recife

  • a priest for 34.1 years
  • a bishop for 15.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013