Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antônio Batista Fragoso

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Crateús, Ceara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Dec 1920BornTeixeira
2 Jul 194423.5Ordained PriestPriest
13 Mar 195736.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Maranho, Brazil
13 Mar 195736.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Ucres
30 May 195736.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ucres
28 Apr 196443.3AppointedBishop of Crateús, Ceara, Brazil
18 Feb 199877.1RetiredBishop of Crateús, Ceara, Brazil
12 Aug 200685.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Crateús, Ceara, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Antônio Batista Fragoso:
Bishop Antônio Batista Fragoso (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Crateús

  • a priest for 62.1 years
  • a bishop for 49.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015