Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Yosafat Ihnatiy Zharskyi, O.S.B.M. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Žyrovyci (Ukrainian), Lithuania

Titular Bishop of Pińsk-Turaŭ (Ukrainian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1778²Born
1802²24.0Solemn VowsMember of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
1804²26.0Ordained PriestPriest of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
10 Dec 183355.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Žyrovyci (Ukrainian), Lithuania
10 Dec 183355.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Pińsk-Turaŭ (Ukrainian), Belarus
2 Feb 183456.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pińsk-Turaŭ (Ukrainian), Belarus
25 Jan 183860.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Žyrovyci (Ukrainian), Lithuania

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Yosafat Ihnatiy Zharskyi
Bishop Yosafat Ihnatiy Zharskyi O.S.B.M. (born 1778, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Žyrovyci

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSt. Catherine, Church, St. Petersburg
Death PlaceByten

  • a priest for 34.0 years
  • a bishop for 3.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Number 14,782
  • b: Hierarchy of the Kyivan Church 861-1990, Page 259, and Page 309
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1834, Number 6
  • b: CB, 22 Oct 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 24 Oct 2018

Quantcast