Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Archbishop Anton (Antonij) Zubko] †

Russian Orthodox

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Archbishop


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jul 1797Born
1824²26.4Ordained PriestPriest of Połock (Polotsk) (Ukrainian), Belarus
11 Dec 183336.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Žyrovyci (Ukrainian), Lithuania
11 Dec 183336.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Brėst (Ukrainian)
2 Feb 183436.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Brėst (Ukrainian)
6 Apr 183941.7CeasedAuxiliary Bishop of Žyrovyci (Ukrainian), Lithuania
6 Apr 183941.7CeasedTitular Bishop of Brėst (Ukrainian)
5 Apr 184143.7AppointedArchbishop
15 Feb 188486.6DiedArchbishop

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Anton (Antonij) Zubko (VIAF: 213867432)
Archbishop Anton (Antonij) Zubko (born , died ) Archbishop

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBielaje, Viterbsk Region
Ordained BishopSt. Catherine, Church, St. Petersburg
Death PlacePažaislis, Lithuania

  • a priest for 60.1 years
  • a bishop for 50.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Number 14,783
  • b: Hierarchy of the Kyivan Church 861-1990, Page 309
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1834, Number 6
  • b: CB, 17 Oct 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 24 Oct 2018

Quantcast