Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio D’Erchia

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Conversano-Monopoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 May 1911BornMassafra
31 Dec 193322.6Ordained PriestPriest of Castellaneta, Italy
17 Dec 196251.5AppointedPrelate of Altamura ed Acquaviva delle Fonti, Italy
17 Dec 196251.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Podalia
19 Mar 196351.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Podalia
24 May 196453.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Conversano, Italy
29 Jun 196958.1AppointedBishop of Monopoli, Italy
21 Jan 197058.6AppointedBishop of Conversano, Italy
30 Sep 198675.3AppointedBishop of Conversano-Monopoli, Italy
11 Feb 198775.7RetiredBishop of Conversano-Monopoli, Italy
6 Oct 199786.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Conversano-Monopoli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio D’Erchia:
Bishop Antonio D’Erchia (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Conversano-Monopoli

  • a priest for 63.7 years
  • a bishop for 34.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1963
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015