Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rizzardo Isolani

Deceased

Bishop of Senigallia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Aug 1687BornBologna
1 May 172133.7Ordained PriestPriest
5 May 173446.7AppointedBishop of Senigallia, Italy
9 May 173446.7Ordained BishopBishop of Senigallia, Italy
2 Jan 174254.4DiedBishop of Senigallia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Rizzardo Isolani:
Bishop Rizzardo Isolani (born , died ) Bishop of Senigallia

  • a priest for 20.6 years
  • a bishop for 7.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 375
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1734, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015