Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Elenito de los Reyes Galido

Deceased

Bishop of Iligan, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Apr 1953Born
25 Apr 197926.0Ordained PriestPriest of Malaybalay, Philippines
25 Mar 200652.9AppointedBishop of Iligan, Philippines
8 Sep 200653.3Ordained BishopBishop of Iligan, Philippines
5 Dec 201764.6DiedBishop of Iligan, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Elenito de los Reyes Galido
Bishop Elenito de los Reyes Galido (born , died ) Bishop of Iligan

EventPlace
Birth PlaceManagok
Ordained BishopCathedral, Malaybalay, Diocese of Malaybalay

  • a priest for 38.6 years
  • a bishop for 11.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Mar 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 186, Number 15,235
  • d: CB, 5 Dec 2017
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast