Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Józef Dembowski

Deceased

Bishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Dec 1729BornPlock
13 Mar 177545.2SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec), Ukraine
30 Apr 177545.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
11 Jun 177545.4Ordained PriestPriest
11 Sep 177545.7ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec), Ukraine
11 Sep 177545.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Draso
5 Nov 177545.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Draso
16 Oct 179868.8SucceededBishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec), Ukraine
13 Sep 180979.7DiedBishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec), Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Jan Józef Dembowski:
Bishop Jan Józef Dembowski (born , died ) Bishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec)

  • a priest for 34.2 years
  • a bishop for 33.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 143, and Page 200
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,655
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1775, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 31 Dec 2015