Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gabriel Jan Podoski

Deceased

Archbishop of Gniezno


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Mar 1719³BornGrenen
25 Nov 174223.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
28 Jul 174324.3Ordained PriestPriest
24 Jun 176748.2SelectedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland
31 Aug 176748.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland
27 Sep 176748.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland
3 Apr 177758.0DiedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gabriel Jan Podoski:
Archbishop Gabriel Jan Podoski (born , died ) Archbishop of Gniezno

  • a priest for 33.6 years
  • a bishop for 9.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 226
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1767, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 11 Dec 2015