Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wojciech Stanisław Leski, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 May 1702³Born
15 Aug 172321.2ProfessedMember of Order of Cistercians
29 Mar 172724.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Cistercians
7 Oct 174644.4SelectedBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
10 Apr 174744.9ConfirmedBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
7 Oct 174745.4Ordained BishopBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
19 Sep 175856.3DiedBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Wojciech Stanisław Leski
Bishop Wojciech Stanisław Leski O. Cist. (born , died ) Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSarnowicz

  • a priest for 31.4 years
  • a bishop for 10.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 188
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1747, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast