Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Józef Ignacy Tadeusz Rybiński

Deceased

Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Apr 1745³BornKoroslyszów
10 Oct 177328.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
17 Oct 177328.4Ordained PriestPriest
3 Jan 177428.6SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
28 Feb 177428.8ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
28 Feb 177428.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Evaria
22 May 177429.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Evaria
23 Jun 177732.1AppointedBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
4 Jan 180660.6DiedBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Józef Ignacy Tadeusz Rybiński
Bishop Józef Ignacy Tadeusz Rybiński (born , died ) Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze)

  • a priest for 32.2 years
  • a bishop for 31.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 211, and Page 445
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Number 13,412
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,892
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1774, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 28 Feb 2016