Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Maciej Grzegorz Garnysz

Deceased

Bishop of Chełm


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Mar 1740BornSkomlinen
23 Mar 176525.0Ordained PriestPriest
18 Dec 177535.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
18 Dec 177535.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Laranda
3 Mar 177636.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Laranda
19 May 178141.2ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
10 Dec 178141.7AppointedBishop of Chełm, Poland
6 Oct 179050.6DiedBishop of Chełm, Poland

MicroData Summary for Maciej Grzegorz Garnysz:
Bishop Maciej Grzegorz Garnysz (born , died ) Bishop of Chełm

  • a priest for 25.5 years
  • a bishop for 14.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi
  • ob/c3/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 27 Sep 2014