Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Owen Cardinal McCann

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Cape Town {Kaapstad}

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jun 1907BornWoodstock
21 Dec 193528.5Ordained PriestPriest of Cape Town, South Africa
12 Mar 195042.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Cape Town, South Africa
12 Mar 195042.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Stectorium
18 May 195042.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Stectorium
11 Jan 195143.5AppointedArchbishop of Cape Town {Kaapstad}, South Africa
22 Feb 196557.6Elevated to Cardinal
22 Feb 196557.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede
20 Oct 198477.3RetiredArchbishop of Cape Town {Kaapstad}, South Africa
26 Mar 199486.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Cape Town {Kaapstad}, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Owen McCann:
Cardinal Owen McCann (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Cape Town {Kaapstad}

  • a priest for 58.3 years
  • a bishop for 43.9 years
  • a cardinal for 29.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c3+: CB
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 138
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1950, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Oct 2013