Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Barroso Filho

Bishop Emeritus of Oliveira, Minas Gerais, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Oct 1928 Born
1 Dec 195729.1Ordained PriestPriest
21 Dec 198355.2AppointedBishop of Oliveira, Minas Gerais, Brazil
19 Mar 198455.4Ordained BishopBishop of Oliveira, Minas Gerais, Brazil
20 Oct 200476.0RetiredBishop of Oliveira, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Francisco Barroso Filho
Bishop Francisco Barroso Filho (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Oliveira

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOuro Preto

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Oliveira.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast