Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Severino Miguel Pelayo

Deceased

Bishop of Philippines, Military

Titular Bishop of Bilta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jan 1934BornCandaba
23 Mar 195824.2Ordained PriestPriest
19 Dec 198551.9AppointedBishop of Philippines, Military
19 Dec 198551.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Bilta
8 Jan 198652.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bilta
26 Feb 199561.1DiedBishop of Philippines, Military

MicroData Summary for Severino Miguel Pelayo:
Bishop Severino Miguel Pelayo (born , died ) Bishop of Philippines, Military

  • a priest for 36.9 years
  • a bishop for 9.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144
  • mn: CB, 26 Jul 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.8, 27 Jul 2015; Data: 27 Jul 2015