Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoine Sabi Bio

Bishop of Natitingou


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1963² BornGounienou
12 Aug 199027.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Natitingou, Benin
7 Dec 199128.9Ordained PriestPriest of Natitingou, Benin
13 Aug 201148.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Natitingou, Benin
13 Mar 201451.1AppointedBishop of Natitingou, Benin
17 May 201451.3Ordained BishopBishop of Natitingou, Benin

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antoine Sabi Bio:
Bishop Antoine Sabi Bio , Bishop of Natitingou

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Natitingou.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 13 Mar 2014
  • od/c01: CB, 13 Mar 2014
  • ob/c2: CB, 22 Mar 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 218, Number 18,162

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015